Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1937 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Darby (Senate Sponsor - Fraser) H.B. No. 1937
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 April 28, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 8, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 8, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to procedures and eligibility for terminating
 participation in the Teacher Retirement System of Texas deferred
 retirement option plan.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 824.805, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read
 as follows:
 (b)  This subsection applies only to a member participating
 in the plan on September 1, 2005, or to a member whose period of
 participation in the plan expired on or before September 1, 2005,
 but who has not retired on or before that date.  A member described
 by this subsection may, before December 31, 2005, revoke the
 member's decision to participate in the plan on a form prescribed by
 and filed with the retirement system.  The retirement system shall
 make account transfers and change records for a member who revokes
 the member's decision to participate in the plan under this
 subsection as if the member had never participated in the plan.
 (c)  A member or beneficiary described by Subsection (d) may,
 on or before December 31, 2015, revoke the member's decision to
 participate in the plan on a form prescribed by and received by the
 retirement system not later than that date. The retirement system
 shall make account transfers and change records for a member whose
 decision to participate in the plan is revoked under this
 subsection, as if the member had never participated in the plan.
 (d)  Subsection (c) applies only to:
 (1)  a member:
 (A)  whose approved period of participation in the
 plan has expired; and
 (B)  who has not retired on or before December 31,
 2015; or
 (2)  a beneficiary of a member whose approved period of
 participation in the plan has expired and who has not retired before
 death if:
 (A)  the beneficiary is eligible to receive both a
 distribution of benefits payable on the death of the member and the
 distributions from the plan; and
 (B)  the member dies on or after September 1,
 2015.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *