Senate | 05/15/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1623 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1623 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3548 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3290 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Record vote | RV#1003 | Journal Page: 3289 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3289 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Amended | 1-Coleman | Journal Page: 3289 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3289 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3205 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Amended | 2-Walle and G. Bonnen | Journal Page: 3205 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3204 | |
House | 05/09/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#686 | Journal Page: 2680 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2680 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1581 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 632 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 632 | |
House | 02/26/2015 | Filed |