House | 05/13/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2811 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 634 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 634 | |
House | 02/27/2015 | Filed |