E | 06/01/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/01/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6047 | |
E | 05/22/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4344 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1897 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4214 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4218 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3904 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1730 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1730 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1730 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1730 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1730 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1730 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1730 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1547 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1298 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1298 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1099 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Record vote | RV#356 | Journal Page: 1865 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1865 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1865 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1816 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1816 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1581 | |
House | 04/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 680 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 680 | |
House | 02/27/2015 | Filed |