Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2055 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Davis of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 2055
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
3- May 15, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
4- and Human Services; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the
5- following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 2055
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to the establishment of a sentinel surveillance program
126 for emerging and neglected tropical diseases.
137 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
148 SECTION 1. Subtitle D, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
159 amended by adding Chapter 100 to read as follows:
1610 CHAPTER 100. EMERGING AND NEGLECTED TROPICAL DISEASES
1711 Sec. 100.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
1812 (1) "Emerging disease" means a disease that is
1913 appearing in a specific population for the first time or that is
2014 increasing in incidence or geographic range.
2115 (2) "Health facility" includes:
2216 (A) a general or special hospital licensed by the
2317 department under Chapter 241;
2418 (B) a physician-owned or physician-operated
2519 clinic;
2620 (C) a publicly or privately funded medical
2721 school;
2822 (D) a state hospital or state school maintained
2923 and managed by the department or the Department of Aging and
3024 Disability Services;
3125 (E) a public health clinic conducted by a local
3226 health unit, health department, or public health district organized
3327 and recognized under Chapter 121; and
3428 (F) another facility specified by a rule adopted
3529 by the executive commissioner.
3630 (3) "Local health unit" has the meaning assigned by
3731 Section 121.004.
3832 (4) "Neglected tropical disease" means a parasitic or
3933 bacterial disease that:
4034 (A) occurs solely or principally in the tropics;
4135 (B) is largely endemic in the developing world;
4236 and
4337 (C) has a potential to spread through
4438 international travel or trade.
4539 Sec. 100.002. CONFIDENTIALITY. (a) Except as specifically
4640 authorized by this chapter, reports, records, and information
4741 furnished to a department employee or to an authorized agent of the
4842 department that relate to cases or suspected cases of a health
4943 condition are confidential and may be used only for the purposes of
5044 this chapter.
5145 (b) Reports, records, and information relating to cases or
5246 suspected cases of health conditions in the possession of the
5347 department under this chapter are not public information under
5448 Chapter 552, Government Code, and may not be released or made public
5549 on subpoena or otherwise except as provided by this chapter.
5650 (c) The department shall release medical, epidemiological,
5751 or toxicological information:
5852 (1) to medical personnel, appropriate state agencies,
5953 health authorities, regional directors, and public officers of
6054 counties and municipalities as necessary to comply with this
6155 chapter and rules relating to the identification, monitoring, and
6256 referral of individuals infected with an emerging or neglected
6357 tropical disease; or
6458 (2) to appropriate federal agencies, such as the
6559 Centers for Disease Control and Prevention of the United States
6660 Public Health Service.
6761 (d) The department may release medical, epidemiological, or
6862 toxicological information for statistical purposes, if released in
6963 a manner that prevents the identification of any person.
7064 Sec. 100.003. LIMITATION OF LIABILITY. A health
7165 professional, a health facility, or an administrator, officer, or
7266 employee of a health facility subject to this chapter is not civilly
7367 or criminally liable for divulging information required to be
7468 released under this chapter, except in a case of gross negligence or
7569 wilful misconduct.
7670 Sec. 100.004. COOPERATION OF GOVERNMENTAL ENTITIES.
7771 Another state board, commission, agency, or governmental entity
7872 capable of assisting the department in carrying out the intent of
7973 this chapter shall cooperate with the department and furnish
8074 expertise, services, and facilities to the program.
8175 Sec. 100.005. SENTINEL SURVEILLANCE PROGRAM. (a) The
8276 executive commissioner shall establish in the department a program
8377 to:
8478 (1) identify by sentinel surveillance individuals
8579 infected with emerging or neglected tropical diseases;
8680 (2) maintain a central database of
8781 laboratory-confirmed cases of emerging and neglected tropical
8882 diseases; and
8983 (3) use the information in the database to investigate
9084 the incidence, prevalence, and trends of emerging and neglected
9185 tropical diseases.
9286 (b) In establishing the sentinel surveillance program for
9387 emerging and neglected tropical diseases, the executive
9488 commissioner shall consider:
9589 (1) the location of health facilities that collect
9690 locally emerging and neglected tropical disease information; and
9791 (2) the use, privacy, and security of existing data
9892 collected by health facilities.
9993 (c) The executive commissioner shall adopt rules to govern
10094 the operation of the program and carry out the intent of this
10195 chapter, including rules that:
10296 (1) specify a system for selecting the demographic
10397 areas in which the department collects information; and
10498 (2) identify the specific emerging and neglected
10599 tropical diseases that are included in the sentinel surveillance
106100 program and the manner in which diseases will be added to the
107101 program as necessary to reflect changing conditions.
108102 Sec. 100.006. DATA COLLECTION. (a) To ensure an accurate
109103 source of data, the executive commissioner may require a health
110104 facility or health professional to make available for review by the
111105 department or by an authorized agent medical records or other
112106 information in the facility's or professional's custody or control
113107 that relates to an occurrence of an emerging or neglected tropical
114108 disease.
115109 (b) The department shall reimburse a health facility or
116110 health professional for the actual costs incurred by the facility
117111 or professional in making copies of medical records or other
118112 information available to the department.
119113 (c) The executive commissioner by rule shall prescribe the
120114 manner in which information is reported to the department.
121115 Sec. 100.007. DATABASE. (a) Information collected and
122116 analyzed by the department or an authorized agent under this
123117 chapter may be placed in a central database to facilitate
124118 information sharing and provider education.
125119 (b) The department may use the database to:
126120 (1) design and evaluate measures to prevent the
127121 occurrence of emerging and neglected tropical diseases and other
128122 health conditions; and
129123 (2) provide information and education to providers on
130124 the incidence of emerging and neglected tropical diseases.
131125 Sec. 100.008. EDUCATIONAL AND INFORMATIONAL MATERIALS. The
132126 department shall make available to health facilities and health
133127 professionals:
134128 (1) educational and informational materials
135129 concerning emerging and neglected tropical diseases; and
136130 (2) information on the importance of monitoring and
137131 surveilling emerging and neglected tropical diseases.
138132 SECTION 2. Not later than November 1, 2015, the executive
139133 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
140134 adopt rules as required by Section 100.005, Health and Safety Code,
141135 as added by this Act.
142136 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
143- * * * * *
137+ ______________________________ ______________________________
138+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
139+ I certify that H.B. No. 2055 was passed by the House on May 8,
140+ 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 4, 2 present, not
141+ voting.
142+ ______________________________
143+ Chief Clerk of the House
144+ I certify that H.B. No. 2055 was passed by the Senate on May
145+ 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
146+ ______________________________
147+ Secretary of the Senate
148+ APPROVED: _____________________
149+ Date
150+ _____________________
151+ Governor