Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2055 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Davis of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 2055
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 15, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a sentinel surveillance program
 for emerging and neglected tropical diseases.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle D, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 100 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 100. EMERGING AND NEGLECTED TROPICAL DISEASES
 Sec. 100.001.  DEFINITIONS.  In this chapter:
 (1)  "Emerging disease" means a disease that is
 appearing in a specific population for the first time or that is
 increasing in incidence or geographic range.
 (2)  "Health facility" includes:
 (A)  a general or special hospital licensed by the
 department under Chapter 241;
 (B)  a physician-owned or physician-operated
 clinic;
 (C)  a publicly or privately funded medical
 school;
 (D)  a state hospital or state school maintained
 and managed by the department or the Department of Aging and
 Disability Services;
 (E)  a public health clinic conducted by a local
 health unit, health department, or public health district organized
 and recognized under Chapter 121; and
 (F)  another facility specified by a rule adopted
 by the executive commissioner.
 (3)  "Local health unit" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 121.004.
 (4)  "Neglected tropical disease" means a parasitic or
 bacterial disease that:
 (A)  occurs solely or principally in the tropics;
 (B)  is largely endemic in the developing world;
 and
 (C)  has a potential to spread through
 international travel or trade.
 Sec. 100.002.  CONFIDENTIALITY.  (a)  Except as specifically
 authorized by this chapter, reports, records, and information
 furnished to a department employee or to an authorized agent of the
 department that relate to cases or suspected cases of a health
 condition are confidential and may be used only for the purposes of
 this chapter.
 (b)  Reports, records, and information relating to cases or
 suspected cases of health conditions in the possession of the
 department under this chapter are not public information under
 Chapter 552, Government Code, and may not be released or made public
 on subpoena or otherwise except as provided by this chapter.
 (c)  The department shall release medical, epidemiological,
 or toxicological information:
 (1)  to medical personnel, appropriate state agencies,
 health authorities, regional directors, and public officers of
 counties and municipalities as necessary to comply with this
 chapter and rules relating to the identification, monitoring, and
 referral of individuals infected with an emerging or neglected
 tropical disease; or
 (2)  to appropriate federal agencies, such as the
 Centers for Disease Control and Prevention of the United States
 Public Health Service.
 (d)  The department may release medical, epidemiological, or
 toxicological information for statistical purposes, if released in
 a manner that prevents the identification of any person.
 Sec. 100.003.  LIMITATION OF LIABILITY.  A health
 professional, a health facility, or an administrator, officer, or
 employee of a health facility subject to this chapter is not civilly
 or criminally liable for divulging information required to be
 released under this chapter, except in a case of gross negligence or
 wilful misconduct.
 Sec. 100.004.  COOPERATION OF GOVERNMENTAL ENTITIES.
 Another state board, commission, agency, or governmental entity
 capable of assisting the department in carrying out the intent of
 this chapter shall cooperate with the department and furnish
 expertise, services, and facilities to the program.
 Sec. 100.005.  SENTINEL SURVEILLANCE PROGRAM.  (a)  The
 executive commissioner shall establish in the department a program
 to:
 (1)  identify by sentinel surveillance individuals
 infected with emerging or neglected tropical diseases;
 (2)  maintain a central database of
 laboratory-confirmed cases of emerging and neglected tropical
 diseases; and
 (3)  use the information in the database to investigate
 the incidence, prevalence, and trends of emerging and neglected
 tropical diseases.
 (b)  In establishing the sentinel surveillance program for
 emerging and neglected tropical diseases, the executive
 commissioner shall consider:
 (1)  the location of health facilities that collect
 locally emerging and neglected tropical disease information; and
 (2)  the use, privacy, and security of existing data
 collected by health facilities.
 (c)  The executive commissioner shall adopt rules to govern
 the operation of the program and carry out the intent of this
 chapter, including rules that:
 (1)  specify a system for selecting the demographic
 areas in which the department collects information; and
 (2)  identify the specific emerging and neglected
 tropical diseases that are included in the sentinel surveillance
 program and the manner in which diseases will be added to the
 program as necessary to reflect changing conditions.
 Sec. 100.006.  DATA COLLECTION.  (a)  To ensure an accurate
 source of data, the executive commissioner may require a health
 facility or health professional to make available for review by the
 department or by an authorized agent medical records or other
 information in the facility's or professional's custody or control
 that relates to an occurrence of an emerging or neglected tropical
 disease.
 (b)  The department shall reimburse a health facility or
 health professional for the actual costs incurred by the facility
 or professional in making copies of medical records or other
 information available to the department.
 (c)  The executive commissioner by rule shall prescribe the
 manner in which information is reported to the department.
 Sec. 100.007.  DATABASE.  (a)  Information collected and
 analyzed by the department or an authorized agent under this
 chapter may be placed in a central database to facilitate
 information sharing and provider education.
 (b)  The department may use the database to:
 (1)  design and evaluate measures to prevent the
 occurrence of emerging and neglected tropical diseases and other
 health conditions; and
 (2)  provide information and education to providers on
 the incidence of emerging and neglected tropical diseases.
 Sec. 100.008.  EDUCATIONAL AND INFORMATIONAL MATERIALS. The
 department shall make available to health facilities and health
 professionals:
 (1)  educational and informational materials
 concerning emerging and neglected tropical diseases; and
 (2)  information on the importance of monitoring and
 surveilling emerging and neglected tropical diseases.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than November 1, 2015, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt rules as required by Section 100.005, Health and Safety Code,
 as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *