E | 06/20/2015 | Vetoed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6050 | |
E | 05/26/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4984 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2290 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4570 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4575 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4337 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1881 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1881 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1881 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1881 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1878 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1877 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1676 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1298 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1298 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1165 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2112 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2021 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Record vote | RV#410 | Journal Page: 2020 |
House | 04/28/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2020 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2020 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1989 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1989 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1745 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 681 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 681 | |
House | 02/27/2015 | Filed |