Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2068 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Coleman (Senate Sponsor - Garcia) H.B. No. 2068
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 18, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 1; May 18, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to automatic employee participation in and administration
 of a deferred compensation plan provided by certain hospital
 districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 609.007(c), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  Except as provided by Section 609.202 or 609.5025, to
 participate in a deferred compensation plan, an employee must
 consent in the contract to automatic payroll deductions in an
 amount equal to the deferred amount.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 609, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter B-1 to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER B-1. PARTICIPATION IN DEFERRED COMPENSATION PLAN BY
 CERTAIN HOSPITAL DISTRICT EMPLOYEES
 Sec. 609.201.  APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER. (a) This
 subchapter applies only to a hospital district created under
 general or special law if the district offers a deferred
 compensation plan to the district's employees under Subchapter B.
 (b)  A hospital district subject to this subchapter may, at
 the district's option, elect to require automatic employee
 participation in a deferred compensation plan under Section
 609.202.
 Sec. 609.202.  AUTOMATIC PARTICIPATION; DEFAULT INVESTMENT
 PRODUCT.  (a)  This section applies only to an employee of a
 hospital district that elects under Section 609.201(b) to require
 automatic employee participation in a deferred compensation plan
 under this section.
 (b)  An employee automatically participates in a deferred
 compensation plan provided by the hospital district unless the
 employee affirmatively elects not to participate in the plan.
 Notwithstanding Sections 609.007(a) and (c), an employee is not
 required to affirmatively contract for and consent to participation
 in a plan under this section.
 (c)  An employee participating in a deferred compensation
 plan under this section makes a contribution of one percent of the
 compensation earned by the employee to a default investment product
 selected by the plan administrator based on the criteria
 established under Section 609.113 and the rules adopted under
 Subsection (f).  The contribution is made by automatic payroll
 deduction.
 (d)  At any time, an employee participating in a deferred
 compensation plan under this section may, in accordance with rules
 adopted by the board of the hospital district, elect to end
 participation in the plan, to contribute to a different investment
 product, to contribute a different amount to the plan, or to
 designate all or a portion of the employee's contribution as a Roth
 contribution subject to the availability of a Roth contribution
 program.
 (e)  A hospital district to which this subchapter applies
 shall ensure that, at the time of employment, each employee is
 informed of:
 (1)  the elections the employee may make under this
 section; and
 (2)  the responsibilities of the employee under Section
 609.010.
 (f)  The board of the hospital district shall adopt rules to
 implement the requirements of this section.  The rules must ensure
 that the operation of a deferred compensation plan under this
 section conforms to the applicable requirements of any federal rule
 that provides fiduciary relief for investments in qualified default
 investment alternatives or otherwise governs default investment
 alternatives under participant-directed individual account plans.
 (g)  The amount deducted under this section from an
 employee's compensation is not deducted for payment of a debt and
 the automatic payroll deduction is not garnishment or assignment of
 wages.
 (h)  Using existing resources, the hospital district shall
 inform new employees of their automatic enrollment in a deferred
 compensation plan and their right to opt out of enrollment.  Using
 existing resources, this information must be included as part of
 the new employee orientation process.  The district shall maintain
 a record of a new employee's acknowledgment of receipt of
 information regarding the ability to opt out of enrollment in a
 deferred compensation plan.
 Sec. 609.203.  DISCRETIONARY TRANSFER. (a) A hospital
 district may transfer an employee's deferred amounts and investment
 income from a qualified investment product to the trust fund of the
 deferred compensation plan in which the employee participates if
 the district determines that the transfer is in the best interest of
 the plan and the employee.
 (b)  The hospital district is not required to give notice of
 a transfer under Subsection (a) to the employee before the transfer
 occurs.
 (c)  Promptly after a transfer under Subsection (a) occurs,
 the hospital district shall give to the employee a notice that:
 (1)  states the reason for the transfer; and
 (2)  requests that the employee promptly designate
 another qualified investment product to receive the transferred
 amount.
 Sec. 609.204.  ALTERNATIVE TO FUND DEPOSIT. Instead of
 depositing deferred amounts and investment income in the trust fund
 of the deferred compensation plan, a hospital district may invest
 deferred amounts and investment income in a qualified investment
 product specifically designated by the district for that purpose.
 Sec. 609.205.  CONTRACTS FOR GOODS AND SERVICES. (a) A
 hospital district may contract for necessary goods and consolidated
 billing, accounting, and other services to be provided in
 connection with a deferred compensation plan.
 (b)  In a contract under Subsection (a), the hospital
 district may provide for periodic audits of the person with whom the
 contract is made. An audit may cover:
 (1)  the proper handling and accounting of public or
 trust funds; and
 (2)  other matters related to the proper performance of
 the contract.
 (c)  The hospital district may contract with a private entity
 to conduct an audit under Subsection (b).
 SECTION 3.  Section 609.202, Government Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to an employee of a hospital district subject
 to that section who initially begins employment on or after January
 1, 2016.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, the acts of a hospital district created under general or
 special law that relate to discretionary transfers of funds and
 consolidation of billing and accounting for deferred compensation
 plans provided by the district to the district's employees and that
 occurred before the effective date of this Act are validated as if
 the acts had occurred as authorized by law.
 (b)  This section does not validate an act that, under the
 law of this state at the time the act occurred, was a misdemeanor or
 felony.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *