Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB207 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Leach, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 207
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to creating the offense of voyeurism; providing a penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 21, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Section 21.16 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.16.  VOYEURISM. (a) A person commits an offense if
 the person, with the intent to arouse or gratify the sexual desire
 of the actor, observes another person without the other person's
 consent while the other person is in a dwelling or structure in
 which the other person has a reasonable expectation of privacy.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c) or (d), an offense
 under this section is a Class C misdemeanor.
 (c)  An offense under this section is a Class B misdemeanor
 if it is shown on the trial of the offense that the actor has
 previously been convicted two or more times of an offense under this
 section.
 (d)  An offense under this section is a state jail felony if
 the victim was a child younger than 14 years of age at the time of
 the offense.
 (e)  If conduct that constitutes an offense under this
 section also constitutes an offense under any other law, the actor
 may be prosecuted under this section, the other law, or both.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *