Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2121 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: King of Uvalde (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2121
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the repeal of obsolete laws governing county road
 systems in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 300 (H.B. 490), Acts of the 52nd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1951 (Article 6812b, Vernon's Texas
 Civil Statutes), is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *