House | 05/14/2015 | Postponed | 9/26/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3521 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3521 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2965 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/10/2015 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 263 | |
House | 02/10/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 263 | |
House | 11/10/2014 | Filed |