Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2168 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Muñoz, Jr. (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 2168
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the payment date for annuities from the Teacher
 Retirement System of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 824.003, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 824.003.  WHEN BENEFITS ARE PAYABLE. Except as
 otherwise provided by this chapter, an annuity provided by this
 chapter is payable for the month in which the person who receives
 the annuity dies. Monthly annuity payments are generally due to be
 paid on the last [first] working day of the [each] month [following
 the month] for which the payment accrues.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *