E
|
06/15/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4774
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4466
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4108
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1853
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1853
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1853
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1853
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1853
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1853
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1853
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1585
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1432
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1432
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1253
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2451
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2284
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#501
|
Journal Page: 2284
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2284
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2284
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2224
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1706
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred directly to s/c on Educator Quality by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2015
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 263
|
House
|
02/10/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 263
|
House
|
11/10/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|