E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2862
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4970
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5212
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2311
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4605
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1467
|
Journal Page: 4605
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4605
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4337
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1885
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1885
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1885
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1885
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1885
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1885
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1885
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1433
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1433
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1346
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#593
|
Journal Page: 2485
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2485
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2485
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2403
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Clardy
|
Journal Page: 2403
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2403
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/4/15 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2226
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2226
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 662
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 662
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|