LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB2182
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB2182
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2182
Compare Versions
HB2182 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2182 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2182 Enrolled May 27, 2015
HB2182 Comm Sub May 19, 2015
HB2182 Engrossed May 5, 2015
HB2182 Comm Sub April 21, 2015
HB2182 Introduced March 3, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB2182 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2182 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2182 Enrolled May 27, 2015
HB2182 Comm Sub May 19, 2015
HB2182 Engrossed May 5, 2015
HB2182 Comm Sub April 21, 2015
HB2182 Introduced March 3, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare