E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6046
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6022
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3508
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3508
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3508
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3507
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3507
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3507
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 3507
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 3507
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3507
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Returned from the House for further action
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Returned to the Senate for further action
|
|
Journal Page: 5561
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 5561
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Motion to concur in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5560
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Returned from the Senate for further action
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate adopts recall resolution
|
HCR 141
|
Journal Page: 3139
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House adopts resolution recalling from Senate
|
HCR 141
|
Journal Page: 5225
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Returned from the House for further action
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Returned to the Senate for further action
|
|
Journal Page: 4937
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4337
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1916
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1916
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1916
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1916
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1916
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1916
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1916
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 West
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1846
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1623
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1623
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1589
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3317
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1034
|
Journal Page: 3316
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3316
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3316
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3246
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#981
|
Journal Page: 3245
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3245
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Amended
|
1-K. King
|
Journal Page: 3244
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3244
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 663
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 663
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|