LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB2187
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB2187
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2187
Compare Versions
HB2187 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2187 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2187 Enrolled May 31, 2015
HB2187 Comm Sub May 20, 2015
HB2187 Engrossed May 13, 2015
HB2187 Comm Sub April 23, 2015
HB2187 Introduced March 3, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB2187 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2187 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2187 Enrolled May 31, 2015
HB2187 Comm Sub May 20, 2015
HB2187 Engrossed May 13, 2015
HB2187 Comm Sub April 23, 2015
HB2187 Introduced March 3, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare