Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB219 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: White of Tyler (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 219
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 NicholsX
 HuffinesX
 EllisX
 FraserX
 GarciaX
 HallX
 HancockX
 KolkhorstX
 TaylorofCollinX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of Farm-to-Market Road 1293 in Hardin
 County as the Game Warden Wesley W. Wagstaff Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.105 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.105.  GAME WARDEN WESLEY W. WAGSTAFF MEMORIAL
 HIGHWAY. (a) Farm-to-Market Road 1293 in Hardin County is
 designated as the Game Warden Wesley W. Wagstaff Memorial Highway.
 The designation is in addition to any other designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Game Warden Wesley W. Wagstaff Memorial Highway
 and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *