E
|
05/29/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5697
|
E
|
05/20/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3798
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3846
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1648
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1648
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1648
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1647
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1647
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1647
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1647
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1546
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 793
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1514
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#198
|
Journal Page: 1513
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1513
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1513
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1462
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1462
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Herrero
|
Journal Page: 1462
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1462
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 687
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 687
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|