Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2208 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Herrero (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 2208
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2015;
 April 21, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to access to criminal history record information by a
 county tax assessor-collector.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.14065 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.14065.  ACCESS TO CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORD
 INFORMATION: COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTOR.  A county tax
 assessor-collector in a county described by Section 520.052,
 Transportation Code, is entitled to obtain from the department
 criminal history record information maintained by the department
 that relates to a person who is an applicant for a motor vehicle
 title service license issued under Subchapter E, Chapter 520,
 Transportation Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *