Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2244 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zerwas, Villalba (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 2244
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 28, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources and Economic Development; May 13, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 13, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of medical waste; adding and amending
 provisions subject to a criminal penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 361.003, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivisions (14-a) and (18-a) to read as
 follows:
 (14-a)  "Health care-related facility" means a
 facility listed under 25 T.A.C. Section 1.134. The term does not
 include:
 (A)  a single-family or multifamily dwelling; or
 (B)  a hotel, motel, or other establishment that
 provides lodging and related services for the public.
 (18-a)  "Medical waste" means treated and untreated
 special waste from health care-related facilities composed of
 animal waste, bulk blood, bulk human blood, bulk human body fluids,
 microbiological waste, pathological waste, and sharps, as those
 terms are defined by 25 T.A.C. Section 1.132, as well as regulated
 medical waste, as that term is defined by 49 C.F.R. Section 173.134.
 The term does not include:
 (A)  waste produced on a farm or ranch as defined
 by 34 T.A.C. Section 3.296(f); or
 (B)  artificial, nonhuman materials removed from
 a patient and requested by the patient, including orthopedic
 devices and breast implants.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 361, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 361.0905 to read as follows:
 Sec. 361.0905.  REGULATION OF MEDICAL WASTE. (a)  The
 commission is responsible under this section for the regulation of
 the handling, transportation, storage, and disposal of medical
 waste.
 (b)  The commission shall accomplish the purposes of this
 chapter by requiring a permit, registration, or other authorization
 for and otherwise regulating the handling, storage, disposal, and
 transportation of medical waste. The commission shall adopt rules
 as necessary to accomplish the purposes of this subchapter.
 (c)  The commission has the powers and duties specifically
 prescribed by this chapter relating to medical waste regulation and
 all other powers necessary or convenient to carry out those
 responsibilities under this chapter.
 (d)  In matters relating to medical waste regulation, the
 commission shall consider water pollution control and water quality
 aspects, air pollution control and ambient air quality aspects, and
 the protection of human health and safety.
 (e)  Rules adopted to regulate the operation of municipal
 solid waste storage and processing units apply in the same manner to
 medical waste only to the extent that the rules address:
 (1)  permit and registration requirements that can be
 made applicable to a facility that handles medical waste, including
 requirements related to:
 (A)  applications;
 (B)  site development;
 (C)  notice; and
 (D)  permit or registration duration and limits;
 (2)  minor modifications to permits and registrations,
 including changes in operating hours and buffer zones;
 (3)  the reconciliation of conflicting site operation
 plan provisions for a site that conducts activities that require a
 separate permit or authorization;
 (4)  waste acceptance and analysis;
 (5)  facility-generated waste, including wastewater
 and sludge;
 (6)  contaminated water management;
 (7)  on-site storage areas for source-separated or
 recyclable materials;
 (8)  the storage of waste:
 (A)  to prevent the waste from becoming a hazard,
 including a fire hazard, to human health or safety;
 (B)  to ensure the use of sufficient containers
 between collections; and
 (C)  to prevent the waste from becoming litter;
 (9)  closure requirements for storage and processing
 units;
 (10)  recordkeeping and reporting requirements, except
 for rules regarding the recordkeeping provisions required to
 justify the levels of recovered recycled products;
 (11)  fire protection;
 (12)  access control;
 (13)  unloading waste;
 (14)  spill prevention and control;
 (15)  operating hours;
 (16)  facility signage;
 (17)  control of litter, including windblown material;
 (18)  noise pollution and visual screening;
 (19)  capacity overloading and mechanical breakdown;
 (20)  sanitation, including employee sanitation
 facilities;
 (21)  ventilation and air pollution control, except as
 those rules apply to:
 (A)  process areas where putrescible waste is
 processed;
 (B)  the minimal air exposure for liquid waste;
 and
 (C)  the cleaning and maintenance of mobile waste
 processing unit equipment; and
 (22)  facility health and safety plans, including
 employee training in health and safety.
 (f)  Medical waste facilities, on-site treatment services
 and mobile treatment units that send treated medical waste and
 treated medical waste including sharps or residuals of sharps to a
 solid waste landfill must include a statement to the solid waste
 landfill that the shipment has been treated by an approved method in
 accordance with 25 T.A.C. Section 1.136 (relating to Approved
 Methods of Treatment and Disposition). Home generated wastes are
 exempted from this requirement.
 (g)  In a facility that handles medical waste processing or
 storage, the commission shall not require a minimum separating
 distance greater than 25 feet between the processing equipment or
 storage area, and the facility boundary owned or controlled by the
 owner or operator.  A medical waste storage unit is not subject to
 this subsection, provided that medical waste contained in transport
 vehicles is refrigerated below 45 degrees if the waste is in the
 vehicle longer than 72 hours.  The commission may consider
 alternatives to the buffer zone requirements of this subsection for
 permitted, registered, or otherwise authorized medical waste
 processing and storage facilities.
 SECTION 3.  Section 7.141(4), Water Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (4)  "Medical waste" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 361.003, Health and Safety [includes animal waste, bulk
 blood and blood products, microbiological waste, pathological
 waste, sharps, and special waste from health care-related
 facilities as those terms are defined in 25 T.A.C. Section 1.132
 (Texas Department of Health, Definition, Treatment, and
 Disposition of Special Waste from Health Care-Related Facilities).
 The term does not include medical waste produced on farmland and
 ranchland as defined by Section 252.001(6), Agriculture] Code.
 SECTION 4.  Section 361.560, Health and Safety Code, as
 amended by S.B. 219, Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular Session,
 2015, is repealed.
 SECTION 5.  (a) Not later than June 1, 2016, the Texas
 Commission on Environmental Quality shall adopt rules to implement
 the changes in law made by this Act. The rules must be adopted in the
 form of a new chapter of the Texas Administrative Code that includes
 all rules of the commission relating to medical waste regulation.
 (b)  Rules adopted to implement the changes in law made by
 this Act must minimize the effect on other rules regulating
 municipal solid waste facilities.
 SECTION 6.  A facility that has a permit, registration,
 pending permit application, or other authorization that allows the
 handling of medical waste is not required to comply with the changes
 in law made by this Act until rules adopted by the Texas Commission
 on Environmental Quality to implement the changes in law made by
 this Act take effect.  Any change to a permit, registration, or
 other authorization in effect on the effective date of this Act that
 is necessary to implement the changes in law made by this Act may be
 authorized without notice and comment and shall not be referred for
 a contested case proceeding.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *