Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB229 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Guillen, Muñoz, Jr. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 229
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
3- May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Subcommittee on Border
4- Security; May 18, 2015, reported favorably to Committee on Veteran
5- Affairs and Military Installations; May 21, 2015, reported
6- favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent
7- to printer.)
1+H.B. No. 229
82
93
10- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
114 AN ACT
125 relating to the disposition of certain surplus motor vehicles and
136 other law enforcement equipment by the Texas Facilities Commission.
147 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
158 SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 2175, Government Code, is
169 amended by adding Section 2175.308 to read as follows:
1710 Sec. 2175.308. EXCEPTION FOR CERTAIN PROPERTY OF DEPARTMENT
1811 OF PUBLIC SAFETY. (a) Notwithstanding any conflicting provision
1912 of this chapter, if the commission determines that this state's
2013 efforts to secure this state's international border and combat
2114 transnational crime will sufficiently benefit from the donation of
2215 the surplus motor vehicles and other law enforcement equipment of
2316 the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas to a municipal
2417 or county law enforcement agency in an economically disadvantaged
2518 area of this state, the commission may transfer the property to the
2619 agency at a price or for other consideration agreed to by the
2720 commission and the agency.
2821 (b) A law enforcement agency that receives surplus property
2922 under Subsection (a) may not sell the property before the second
3023 anniversary of the date the property is received.
3124 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
32- * * * * *
25+ ______________________________ ______________________________
26+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
27+ I certify that H.B. No. 229 was passed by the House on April
28+ 23, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not
29+ voting.
30+ ______________________________
31+ Chief Clerk of the House
32+ I certify that H.B. No. 229 was passed by the Senate on May
33+ 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
34+ ______________________________
35+ Secretary of the Senate
36+ APPROVED: _____________________
37+ Date
38+ _____________________
39+ Governor