By: Guillen, Muñoz, Jr. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 229 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015; May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Subcommittee on Border Security; May 18, 2015, reported favorably to Committee on Veteran Affairs and Military Installations; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the disposition of certain surplus motor vehicles and other law enforcement equipment by the Texas Facilities Commission. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 2175, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 2175.308 to read as follows: Sec. 2175.308. EXCEPTION FOR CERTAIN PROPERTY OF DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY. (a) Notwithstanding any conflicting provision of this chapter, if the commission determines that this state's efforts to secure this state's international border and combat transnational crime will sufficiently benefit from the donation of the surplus motor vehicles and other law enforcement equipment of the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas to a municipal or county law enforcement agency in an economically disadvantaged area of this state, the commission may transfer the property to the agency at a price or for other consideration agreed to by the commission and the agency. (b) A law enforcement agency that receives surplus property under Subsection (a) may not sell the property before the second anniversary of the date the property is received. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. * * * * *