E | 06/19/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/19/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6049 | |
E | 05/30/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6025 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3504 | |
House | 05/29/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5564 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5571 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4981 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Remarks ordered printed | Journal Page: 2615 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2615 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2615 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2615 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2615 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2614 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2614 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2614 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1946 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1164 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2112 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2017 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Record vote | RV#404 | Journal Page: 2016 |
House | 04/28/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2016 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2016 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1983 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Amended | 1-S. Davis | Journal Page: 1983 |
House | 04/27/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1983 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1783 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Posting rule suspended | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics | Journal Page: 850 | |
House | 03/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 850 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Filed |