Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2303 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kuempel, Fallon (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 2303
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 18, 2015;
 May 19, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a landowner's liability for injuries incurred during
 certain recreational activities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 75.001(3), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (3)  "Recreation" means an activity such as:
 (A)  hunting;
 (B)  fishing;
 (C)  swimming;
 (D)  boating;
 (E)  camping;
 (F)  picnicking;
 (G)  hiking;
 (H)  pleasure driving, including off-road
 motorcycling and off-road automobile driving and the use of
 all-terrain vehicles and recreational off-highway vehicles;
 (I)  nature study, including bird-watching;
 (J)  cave exploration;
 (K)  waterskiing and other water sports;
 (L)  any other activity associated with enjoying
 nature or the outdoors;
 (M)  bicycling and mountain biking;
 (N)  disc golf;
 (O)  on-leash and off-leash walking of dogs; or
 (P)  radio control flying and related activities.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a cause of action that accrues on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A cause of action that accrues before the effective date
 of this Act is governed by the law in effect immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *