Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1818
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1818
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1590
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3299
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1013
|
Journal Page: 3298
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3298
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3298
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3215
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3215
|
House
|
05/09/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#686
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 2127
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2127
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1499
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 723
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 723
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|