House | 05/14/2015 | Postponed | 7/4/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3536 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3535 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Postponed | 5/14/15 5:00 AM | Journal Page: 3348 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3348 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Postponed | 5/13/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3198 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3197 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Postponed | 5/12/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2731 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2731 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2268 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 852 | |
House | 03/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 852 | |
House | 03/04/2015 | Filed |