1 | 1 | | 84R4155 KJE-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Gutierrez H.B. No. 2357 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the investigation of deaths involving peace officers. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 2, Code of Criminal Procedure, is |
---|
10 | 10 | | amended by adding Article 2.023 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | Art. 2.023. REVIEW OF OFFICER-INVOLVED DEATHS. (a) In this |
---|
12 | 12 | | article: |
---|
13 | 13 | | (1) "Law enforcement agency" means an agency of the |
---|
14 | 14 | | state or an agency of a political subdivision of the state |
---|
15 | 15 | | authorized by law to employ peace officers. |
---|
16 | 16 | | (2) "Law enforcement review board" means the board |
---|
17 | 17 | | established under Section 402.038, Government Code. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (3) "Officer-involved death" means any death caused by |
---|
19 | 19 | | a peace officer acting under the authority of the state or a |
---|
20 | 20 | | political subdivision of the state. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (b) Each law enforcement agency shall adopt a written policy |
---|
22 | 22 | | detailing the procedure for investigating officer-involved deaths. |
---|
23 | 23 | | The policy must require: |
---|
24 | 24 | | (1) a team of three investigators to investigate the |
---|
25 | 25 | | officer-involved death, two of whom must be employed by a law |
---|
26 | 26 | | enforcement agency that does not employ a peace officer involved in |
---|
27 | 27 | | the death being investigated; and |
---|
28 | 28 | | (2) if the death being investigated is traffic |
---|
29 | 29 | | related, the use of a crash reconstruction unit from a law |
---|
30 | 30 | | enforcement agency that does not employ a peace officer involved in |
---|
31 | 31 | | the death being investigated. |
---|
32 | 32 | | (c) A law enforcement agency may conduct an internal |
---|
33 | 33 | | investigation into an officer-involved death if the internal |
---|
34 | 34 | | investigation does not interfere with the investigation required |
---|
35 | 35 | | under Subsection (b) or (e). |
---|
36 | 36 | | (d) The investigative team established under Subsection (b) |
---|
37 | 37 | | shall submit a report to the law enforcement review board on the |
---|
38 | 38 | | officer-involved death on conclusion of the team's investigation. |
---|
39 | 39 | | (e) As soon as practicable after receiving the |
---|
40 | 40 | | investigative team's report, the law enforcement review board shall |
---|
41 | 41 | | review the report and conduct or direct the team to conduct |
---|
42 | 42 | | additional investigations as necessary. When the review is |
---|
43 | 43 | | completed, the board may make recommendations as follows: |
---|
44 | 44 | | (1) regarding prosecution, to the prosecutor with |
---|
45 | 45 | | felony jurisdiction in the county in which the death occurred; and |
---|
46 | 46 | | (2) regarding disciplinary measures, to: |
---|
47 | 47 | | (A) the chief administrator of the law |
---|
48 | 48 | | enforcement agency that employs the peace officer involved in the |
---|
49 | 49 | | death being investigated; and |
---|
50 | 50 | | (B) the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement. |
---|
51 | 51 | | (f) Not later than 72 hours after the law enforcement review |
---|
52 | 52 | | board's review is completed, the office of the attorney general |
---|
53 | 53 | | shall post the investigative team's report and the board's |
---|
54 | 54 | | recommendations on the office's Internet website, redacting any |
---|
55 | 55 | | information required to be kept confidential by other law. |
---|
56 | 56 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 402, Government Code, is |
---|
57 | 57 | | amended by adding Section 402.038 to read as follows: |
---|
58 | 58 | | Sec. 402.038. LAW ENFORCEMENT REVIEW BOARD. (a) In this |
---|
59 | 59 | | section, "board" means the law enforcement review board established |
---|
60 | 60 | | under this section. |
---|
61 | 61 | | (b) The law enforcement review board is established to |
---|
62 | 62 | | investigate and review each death caused by a peace officer acting |
---|
63 | 63 | | under the authority of the state or a political subdivision of the |
---|
64 | 64 | | state, as required by Article 2.023, Code of Criminal Procedure. |
---|
65 | 65 | | (c) The office of the attorney general shall provide staff, |
---|
66 | 66 | | a main office, and other support necessary for the board to perform |
---|
67 | 67 | | the board's duties under this section. |
---|
68 | 68 | | (d) The board is composed of the following members appointed |
---|
69 | 69 | | by the governor: |
---|
70 | 70 | | (1) an assistant attorney general; |
---|
71 | 71 | | (2) a retired judge as defined by Section 74.041; |
---|
72 | 72 | | (3) a former district attorney or assistant district |
---|
73 | 73 | | attorney with at least 10 years' experience in that capacity; |
---|
74 | 74 | | (4) a former sheriff, chief deputy sheriff, or chief |
---|
75 | 75 | | of police; and |
---|
76 | 76 | | (5) a professor or researcher affiliated with a state |
---|
77 | 77 | | institution of higher education who has expertise in the field of |
---|
78 | 78 | | criminal law or criminal justice. |
---|
79 | 79 | | (e) Members of the board serve staggered terms of six years |
---|
80 | 80 | | with the terms of one or two members expiring February 1 of each |
---|
81 | 81 | | odd-numbered year. A vacancy on the board is filled in the same |
---|
82 | 82 | | manner as the original appointment. |
---|
83 | 83 | | (f) Members of the board serve without compensation but are |
---|
84 | 84 | | entitled to be reimbursed for reasonable and necessary expenses |
---|
85 | 85 | | incurred in performing official duties. |
---|
86 | 86 | | (g) The board shall adopt rules as necessary to implement |
---|
87 | 87 | | this section. |
---|
88 | 88 | | SECTION 3. (a) Not later than December 1, 2015, the |
---|
89 | 89 | | governor shall make the appointments to the law enforcement review |
---|
90 | 90 | | board as required by Section 402.038, Government Code, as added by |
---|
91 | 91 | | this Act. In appointing the initial members of the board, the |
---|
92 | 92 | | governor shall appoint one member to a term expiring February 1, |
---|
93 | 93 | | 2017, two to terms expiring February 1, 2019, and two to terms |
---|
94 | 94 | | expiring February 1, 2021. |
---|
95 | 95 | | (b) Not later than January 1, 2016, each law enforcement |
---|
96 | 96 | | agency shall comply with the requirements under Article 2.023, Code |
---|
97 | 97 | | of Criminal Procedure, as added by this Act. |
---|
98 | 98 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
99 | 99 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
100 | 100 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
101 | 101 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
102 | 102 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|