Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2357 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/04/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R4155 KJE-D
 By: Gutierrez H.B. No. 2357


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the investigation of deaths involving peace officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 2.023 to read as follows:
 Art. 2.023.  REVIEW OF OFFICER-INVOLVED DEATHS. (a) In this
 article:
 (1)  "Law enforcement agency" means an agency of the
 state or an agency of a political subdivision of the state
 authorized by law to employ peace officers.
 (2)  "Law enforcement review board" means the board
 established under Section 402.038, Government Code.
 (3)  "Officer-involved death" means any death caused by
 a peace officer acting under the authority of the state or a
 political subdivision of the state.
 (b)  Each law enforcement agency shall adopt a written policy
 detailing the procedure for investigating officer-involved deaths.
 The policy must require:
 (1)  a team of three investigators to investigate the
 officer-involved death, two of whom must be employed by a law
 enforcement agency that does not employ a peace officer involved in
 the death being investigated; and
 (2)  if the death being investigated is traffic
 related, the use of a crash reconstruction unit from a law
 enforcement agency that does not employ a peace officer involved in
 the death being investigated.
 (c)  A law enforcement agency may conduct an internal
 investigation into an officer-involved death if the internal
 investigation does not interfere with the investigation required
 under Subsection (b) or (e).
 (d)  The investigative team established under Subsection (b)
 shall submit a report to the law enforcement review board on the
 officer-involved death on conclusion of the team's investigation.
 (e)  As soon as practicable after receiving the
 investigative team's report, the law enforcement review board shall
 review the report and conduct or direct the team to conduct
 additional investigations as necessary. When the review is
 completed, the board may make recommendations as follows:
 (1)  regarding prosecution, to the prosecutor with
 felony jurisdiction in the county in which the death occurred; and
 (2)  regarding disciplinary measures, to:
 (A)  the chief administrator of the law
 enforcement agency that employs the peace officer involved in the
 death being investigated; and
 (B)  the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement.
 (f)  Not later than 72 hours after the law enforcement review
 board's review is completed, the office of the attorney general
 shall post the investigative team's report and the board's
 recommendations on the office's Internet website, redacting any
 information required to be kept confidential by other law.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 402, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 402.038 to read as follows:
 Sec. 402.038.  LAW ENFORCEMENT REVIEW BOARD. (a) In this
 section, "board" means the law enforcement review board established
 under this section.
 (b)  The law enforcement review board is established to
 investigate and review each death caused by a peace officer acting
 under the authority of the state or a political subdivision of the
 state, as required by Article 2.023, Code of Criminal Procedure.
 (c)  The office of the attorney general shall provide staff,
 a main office, and other support necessary for the board to perform
 the board's duties under this section.
 (d)  The board is composed of the following members appointed
 by the governor:
 (1)  an assistant attorney general;
 (2)  a retired judge as defined by Section 74.041;
 (3)  a former district attorney or assistant district
 attorney with at least 10 years' experience in that capacity;
 (4)  a former sheriff, chief deputy sheriff, or chief
 of police; and
 (5)  a professor or researcher affiliated with a state
 institution of higher education who has expertise in the field of
 criminal law or criminal justice.
 (e)  Members of the board serve staggered terms of six years
 with the terms of one or two members expiring February 1 of each
 odd-numbered year. A vacancy on the board is filled in the same
 manner as the original appointment.
 (f)  Members of the board serve without compensation but are
 entitled to be reimbursed for reasonable and necessary expenses
 incurred in performing official duties.
 (g)  The board shall adopt rules as necessary to implement
 this section.
 SECTION 3.  (a) Not later than December 1, 2015, the
 governor shall make the appointments to the law enforcement review
 board as required by Section 402.038, Government Code, as added by
 this Act. In appointing the initial members of the board, the
 governor shall appoint one member to a term expiring February 1,
 2017, two to terms expiring February 1, 2019, and two to terms
 expiring February 1, 2021.
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2016, each law enforcement
 agency shall comply with the requirements under Article 2.023, Code
 of Criminal Procedure, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.