Senate | 05/15/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1623 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1623 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1061 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1802 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Record vote | RV#330 | Journal Page: 1802 |
House | 04/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1802 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1801 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1777 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1777 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Point of order overruled | Rule 8, Section 1(d) | Journal Page: 1777 |
House | 04/21/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1777 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1581 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 696 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 696 | |
House | 03/04/2015 | Filed |