Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1818
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1818
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1590
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3318
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1035
|
Journal Page: 3317
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3317
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3317
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3248
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#982
|
Journal Page: 3248
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3248
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Amended
|
2-Keffer
|
Journal Page: 3248
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3247
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/12/15 4:45 PM
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/09/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#686
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|