Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2392 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Anchia, Keffer (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 2392
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 14, 2015;
 May 21, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 2; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a residential energy efficiency
 loan program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 388, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 388.013 to read as follows:
 Sec. 388.013.  ENERGY EFFICIENCY LOAN PROGRAM. (a) The
 comptroller and the State Energy Conservation Office by rule shall
 establish and administer a self-sustaining program that issues
 loans to be used for improvements that increase the energy
 efficiency of residences that are not newly constructed.
 (b)  Rules adopted under this section must establish
 eligibility requirements for receipt of a loan issued under this
 section, including energy savings cost-effectiveness criteria.
 (c)  The State Energy Conservation Office annually shall
 evaluate the effectiveness of the program established under this
 section and quantify energy savings realized as a result of the
 program.
 (d)  Money from the general revenue fund may not be
 appropriated for the purpose of implementing the program
 established under this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *