E
|
05/28/2015
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5572
|
E
|
05/20/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3785
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3846
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1392
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1122
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1122
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1032
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1830
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1764
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#308
|
Journal Page: 1764
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1764
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1764
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#286
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1551
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 700
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 700
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|