E
|
06/16/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/16/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/26/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2290
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4337
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1904
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1904
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1904
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1904
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1904
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1904
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1903
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1625
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 930
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1560
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#221
|
Journal Page: 1560
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1560
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1559
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1544
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1544
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1041
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 723
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 723
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|