Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2430 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kuempel, Fallon (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 2430
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2015;
 April 21, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 15, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to food and beverage consumption in certain public
 swimming pools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 341.064, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (l-1) to read as follows:
 (l-1)  Rules adopted under this chapter may not prohibit the
 consumption of food or beverages in a public swimming pool that is
 privately owned and operated.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *