Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2436 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 84R12454 AAF-F
22 By: Phillips H.B. No. 2436
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to passenger security screening.
88 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
99 SECTION 1. Section 23.002(a), Transportation Code, is
1010 amended to read as follows:
1111 (a) The governing body may commission an employee of an
1212 airport security force established under this chapter as a peace
1313 officer, subject to Subchapter G, Chapter 1701, Occupations
1414 [Subchapter C, Chapter 415, Government] Code, if the employee gives
1515 an oath and a bond for the faithful performance of the employee's
1616 duties as required by the governing body.
1717 SECTION 2. Chapter 23, Transportation Code, is amended by
1818 adding Sections 23.004 and 23.005 to read as follows:
1919 Sec. 23.004. ANALYSIS AND REPORT REGARDING PASSENGER
2020 SECURITY SCREENINGS. (a) In this section, "airport operator"
2121 means:
2222 (1) a local government that owns or controls an
2323 airport; or
2424 (2) a person who operates, as the agent of a local
2525 government or otherwise, an airport owned or controlled by the
2626 local government.
2727 (b) An airport operator shall establish a program to collect
2828 complaints received by the operator regarding passenger security
2929 screenings. Complaints collected under this section are
3030 confidential and not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552,
3131 Government Code.
3232 (c) Not later than October 1 of each year, and in a manner
3333 prescribed by the director of the governor's Texas homeland
3434 security office, an airport operator shall submit to the executive
3535 director of the Texas Department of Transportation and the director
3636 of the governor's Texas homeland security office an analysis of
3737 complaints regarding passenger security screenings received during
3838 the most recent state fiscal year. The analysis must identify the
3939 general categories of complaints regarding passenger security
4040 screenings and provide trend data on the frequency of those
4141 complaints. The analysis may not contain any personal passenger
4242 information that would compromise a passenger's privacy or safety.
4343 (d) Not later than December 1 of each year, the director of
4444 the governor's Texas homeland security office shall submit a report
4545 to the congressional delegation of this state. The report must
4646 provide an analysis of complaints regarding passenger security
4747 screenings in this state and make recommendations regarding ways in
4848 which to conduct effective passenger security screenings while
4949 minimizing unnecessary impositions on airline travelers' time and
5050 privacy.
5151 (e) This section expires January 1, 2021.
5252 Sec. 23.005. SCREENING PARTNERSHIP PROGRAM. (a) In this
5353 section, "airport operator" has the meaning assigned by Section
5454 23.004.
5555 (b) Not later than January 1, 2016, an airport operator
5656 shall apply to the Under Secretary of Transportation for Security
5757 under 49 U.S.C. Section 44920 to participate in the security
5858 screening opt-out program.
5959 (c) The airport operator shall submit the following
6060 information to the executive director of the Texas Department of
6161 Transportation and the director of the governor's Texas homeland
6262 security office:
6363 (1) not later than the 30th day after the date an
6464 application was submitted under Subsection (b), a letter confirming
6565 the submission of an application;
6666 (2) not later than the 30th day after receiving the
6767 notice, a copy of the notice of the disposition of the application;
6868 and
6969 (3) not later than January 31, 2021, a written
7070 statement regarding any failure to receive a notice of the
7171 disposition of the application.
7272 (d) This section expires August 31, 2021.
7373 SECTION 3. As soon as practicable after the effective date
7474 of this Act, the director of the governor's Texas homeland security
7575 office shall prescribe procedures to implement the change in law
7676 made by Section 23.004, Transportation Code, as added by this Act.
7777 SECTION 4. (a) Sections 23.004(c) and (d), Transportation
7878 Code, as added by this Act, take effect January 1, 2016.
7979 (b) Except as otherwise provided by Subsection (a) of this
8080 section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.