Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2436 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/05/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R12454 AAF-F
 By: Phillips H.B. No. 2436


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to passenger security screening.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 23.002(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The governing body may commission an employee of an
 airport security force established under this chapter as a peace
 officer, subject to Subchapter G, Chapter 1701, Occupations
 [Subchapter C, Chapter 415, Government] Code, if the employee gives
 an oath and a bond for the faithful performance of the employee's
 duties as required by the governing body.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 23, Transportation Code, is amended by
 adding Sections 23.004 and 23.005 to read as follows:
 Sec. 23.004.  ANALYSIS AND REPORT REGARDING PASSENGER
 SECURITY SCREENINGS. (a) In this section, "airport operator"
 means:
 (1)  a local government that owns or controls an
 airport; or
 (2)  a person who operates, as the agent of a local
 government or otherwise, an airport owned or controlled by the
 local government.
 (b)  An airport operator shall establish a program to collect
 complaints received by the operator regarding passenger security
 screenings. Complaints collected under this section are
 confidential and not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552,
 Government Code.
 (c)  Not later than October 1 of each year, and in a manner
 prescribed by the director of the governor's Texas homeland
 security office, an airport operator shall submit to the executive
 director of the Texas Department of Transportation and the director
 of the governor's Texas homeland security office an analysis of
 complaints regarding passenger security screenings received during
 the most recent state fiscal year. The analysis must identify the
 general categories of complaints regarding passenger security
 screenings and provide trend data on the frequency of those
 complaints. The analysis may not contain any personal passenger
 information that would compromise a passenger's privacy or safety.
 (d)  Not later than December 1 of each year, the director of
 the governor's Texas homeland security office shall submit a report
 to the congressional delegation of this state. The report must
 provide an analysis of complaints regarding passenger security
 screenings in this state and make recommendations regarding ways in
 which to conduct effective passenger security screenings while
 minimizing unnecessary impositions on airline travelers' time and
 privacy.
 (e)  This section expires January 1, 2021.
 Sec. 23.005.  SCREENING PARTNERSHIP PROGRAM.  (a) In this
 section, "airport operator" has the meaning assigned by Section
 23.004.
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2016, an airport operator
 shall apply to the Under Secretary of Transportation for Security
 under 49 U.S.C. Section 44920 to participate in the security
 screening opt-out program.
 (c)  The airport operator shall submit the following
 information to the executive director of the Texas Department of
 Transportation and the director of the governor's Texas homeland
 security office:
 (1)  not later than the 30th day after the date an
 application was submitted under Subsection (b), a letter confirming
 the submission of an application;
 (2)  not later than the 30th day after receiving the
 notice, a copy of the notice of the disposition of the application;
 and
 (3)  not later than January 31, 2021, a written
 statement regarding any failure to receive a notice of the
 disposition of the application.
 (d)  This section expires August 31, 2021.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the director of the governor's Texas homeland security
 office shall prescribe procedures to implement the change in law
 made by Section 23.004, Transportation Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  (a) Sections 23.004(c) and (d), Transportation
 Code, as added by this Act, take effect January 1, 2016.
 (b)  Except as otherwise provided by Subsection (a) of this
 section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.