House | 05/11/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3014 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 487 | Journal Page: 3014 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Postponed | 5/9/15 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2630 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2630 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1944 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 701 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 701 | |
House | 03/05/2015 | Filed |