E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4974
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2432
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2432
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2432
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2432
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2432
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2432
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2432
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1337
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1337
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1100
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1848
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#341
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1839
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1839
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1530
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 703
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 703
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|