1 | | - | By: Smith (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Galveston) H.B. No. 2464 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015; |
---|
3 | | - | May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business |
---|
4 | | - | and Commerce; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following |
---|
5 | | - | vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 2464 |
---|
21 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
22 | 5 | | relating to the transfer of a plumber's license on the retirement or |
---|
23 | 6 | | death of the plumber. |
---|
24 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
25 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 1301.359(b), Occupations Code, is |
---|
26 | 9 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
27 | 10 | | (b) Except as provided by Section 1301.406, a [A] license, |
---|
28 | 11 | | endorsement, or registration issued under this chapter is not |
---|
29 | 12 | | assignable or transferable. |
---|
30 | 13 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter H, Chapter 1301, Occupations Code, is |
---|
31 | 14 | | amended by adding Section 1301.406 to read as follows: |
---|
32 | 15 | | Sec. 1301.406. TRANSFER OF LICENSE. (a) On approval by the |
---|
33 | 16 | | board, a person who holds an unexpired license under this chapter |
---|
34 | 17 | | and whose license has been held continuously for at least 50 |
---|
35 | 18 | | consecutive years may transfer the license on the date of the |
---|
36 | 19 | | person's retirement or death to another person who: |
---|
37 | 20 | | (1) is related within the second degree by |
---|
38 | 21 | | consanguinity to the transferor; and |
---|
39 | 22 | | (2) holds a license as a journeyman plumber or master |
---|
40 | 23 | | plumber under this chapter. |
---|
41 | 24 | | (b) The application for a license transfer under this |
---|
42 | 25 | | section must include the transferor's consent and a designation of |
---|
43 | 26 | | whether the license will transfer on the retirement or death of the |
---|
44 | 27 | | transferor. |
---|
45 | 28 | | (c) The board shall transfer a license to a person who |
---|
46 | 29 | | submits an application and presents evidence satisfactory to the |
---|
47 | 30 | | board that: |
---|
48 | 31 | | (1) the person meets the requirements under |
---|
49 | 32 | | Subsections (a)(1) and (a)(2); and |
---|
50 | 33 | | (2) the transferor is retired or dead. |
---|
51 | 34 | | SECTION 3. As soon as practicable after the effective date |
---|
52 | 35 | | of this Act, the Texas State Board of Plumbing Examiners shall adopt |
---|
53 | 36 | | rules and prescribe forms necessary to implement the changes in law |
---|
54 | 37 | | made by Section 1301.406, Occupations Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
55 | 38 | | SECTION 4. Not later than January 1, 2016, the Texas State |
---|
56 | 39 | | Board of Plumbing Examiners shall begin accepting applications for |
---|
57 | 40 | | the transfer of licenses under Section 1301.406, Occupations Code, |
---|
58 | 41 | | as added by this Act. |
---|
59 | 42 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
60 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 43 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 44 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 45 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 2464 was passed by the House on April |
---|
| 46 | + | 23, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 2, 2 present, not |
---|
| 47 | + | voting. |
---|
| 48 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 49 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 50 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 2464 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 51 | + | 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 52 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 53 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 54 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 55 | + | Date |
---|
| 56 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 57 | + | Governor |
---|