Senate | 05/18/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1672 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1672 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1634 | |
House | 05/17/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3788 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3579 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Record vote | RV#1119 | Journal Page: 3579 |
House | 05/15/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3579 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3579 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3553 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3553 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2559 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1647 | |
House | 02/11/2015 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 276 | |
House | 02/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 276 | |
House | 11/12/2014 | Filed |