Senate | 05/11/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1165 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2112 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2016 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Record vote | RV#403 | Journal Page: 2015 |
House | 04/28/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2015 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2015 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1982 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Record vote | RV#392 | Journal Page: 1981 |
House | 04/27/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1981 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1981 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1435 | |
House | 04/01/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 725 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 725 | |
House | 03/06/2015 | Filed |