Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2513 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/06/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R8300 AJZ-D
 By: Kacal H.B. No. 2513


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of automatic location identification and
 automatic tier two facility identification as part of the 9-1-1
 system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 771.051(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission is the state's authority on emergency
 communications.  The commission shall:
 (1)  administer the implementation of statewide 9-1-1
 service and the poison control network, including poison control
 centers under Chapter 777;
 (2)  develop minimum performance standards for
 equipment and operation of 9-1-1 service to be followed in
 developing regional plans under Section 771.055, including
 requirements that the plans provide for:
 (A)  automatic number identification by which the
 telephone number of the caller is automatically identified at the
 public safety answering point receiving the call; [and]
 (B)  automatic location identification, as
 defined by Section 772.001;
 (C)  automatic tier two facility identification,
 as defined by Section 772.001; and
 (D)  other features the commission considers
 appropriate;
 (3)  examine and approve or disapprove regional plans
 as provided by Section 771.056;
 (4)  recommend minimum training standards, assist in
 training, and provide assistance in the establishment and operation
 of 9-1-1 service;
 (5)  allocate money to prepare and operate regional
 plans as provided by Section 771.056;
 (6)  develop and provide public education materials and
 training;
 (7)  plan, implement, operate, and maintain poison
 control center databases and assist in planning, supporting, and
 facilitating 9-1-1 databases, as needed;
 (8)  provide grants or contracts for services that
 enhance the effectiveness of 9-1-1 service;
 (9)  coordinate emergency communications services and
 providers;
 (10)  make reasonable efforts to gain voluntary
 cooperation in the commission's activities of emergency
 communications authorities and providers outside the commission's
 jurisdiction, including:
 (A)  making joint communications to state and
 federal regulators; and
 (B)  arranging cooperative purchases of equipment
 or services; and
 (11)  accept, receive, and deposit in its account in
 the general revenue fund gifts, grants, and royalties from public
 and private entities.  Gifts, grants, and royalties may be used for
 the purposes of the commission.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 771, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 771.0545 to read as follows:
 Sec. 771.0545.  AUTOMATIC TIER TWO FACILITY IDENTIFICATION.
 An emergency communication district that does not participate in a
 regional plan shall provide automatic tier two facility
 identification as part of the 9-1-1 system.
 SECTION 3.  Section 772.001, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivision (22) to read as follows:
 (22)  "Automatic tier two facility identification"
 means a feature corresponding to automatic location identification
 in which the address or location provided by the automatic location
 identification feature is matched with information indicating
 whether the address or location is a facility that is required to
 file a tier two form with the Department of State Health Services
 under Chapter 505, 506, or 507.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter A, Chapter 772, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 772.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 772.004.  AUTOMATIC TIER TWO FACILITY IDENTIFICATION.
 Notwithstanding any provision of this chapter or Chapter 771, an
 emergency communication district shall provide automatic tier two
 facility identification as part of the 9-1-1 system for each
 participating jurisdiction.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter D, Chapter 1001, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 1001.085 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1001.085.  TIER TWO FACILITY LOCATION INFORMATION. The
 department shall provide the address or location of each facility
 that is required to file a tier two form with the department to the
 applicable regional planning commission or emergency communication
 district.
 SECTION 6.  (a)  The Commission on State Emergency
 Communications shall adopt the performance standards relating to
 automatic location identification and automatic tier two facility
 identification as required by Section 771.051(a), Health and Safety
 Code, as amended by this Act, not later than January 1, 2016.
 (b)  Each regional planning commission, as that term is
 defined by Section 771.001, Health and Safety Code, shall submit an
 amendment to that commission's regional plan not later than
 February 1, 2016. The amendment must describe the procedures the
 regional planning commission will use to fully implement automatic
 tier two facility identification not later than March 1, 2016.
 (c)  An emergency communication district shall fully
 implement automatic tier two facility identification as required by
 Sections 771.0545 and 772.004, Health and Safety Code, as added by
 this Act, not later than March 1, 2016.
 (d)  The Department of State Health Services shall provide
 tier two facility location information as required by Section
 1001.085, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, not later
 than January 1, 2016.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.