Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2515 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Muñoz, Jr. (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 2515
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 11, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 11, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 LucioX
 BettencourtX
 CampbellX
 GarciaX
 MenéndezX
 NicholsX
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authority to establish, operate, and maintain a foreign
 trade zone at or adjacent to the Pharr port of entry.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 681, Business & Commerce
 Code, is amended by adding Section 681.179 to read as follows:
 Sec. 681.179.  CITY OF PHARR OR DESIGNEE. The City of Pharr,
 or a corporation organized under the laws of this state and
 designated by the City of Pharr, may apply for and accept a grant of
 authority to establish, operate, and maintain:
 (1)  a foreign trade zone at or adjacent to the Pharr
 port of entry; and
 (2)  other subzones.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *