Senate | 05/11/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1397 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2811 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Record vote | RV#644 | Journal Page: 2578 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2578 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2578 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2526 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2526 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1632 | |
House | 04/07/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 727 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 727 | |
House | 03/06/2015 | Filed |