E
|
06/16/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/16/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4774
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4467
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4110
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1722
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3137
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#919
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3118
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3118
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1830
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 728
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 728
|
House
|
03/06/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|