Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2540 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Simpson (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 2540
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 19, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 19, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of Spur 63 in Gregg County as the Texas
 Ranger Glenn Elliott Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.106 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.106.  TEXAS RANGER GLENN ELLIOTT MEMORIAL HIGHWAY.
 (a) Spur 63 in Gregg County between its intersection with U.S.
 Highway 80 and Spur 502 is designated as the Texas Ranger Glenn
 Elliott Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Texas Ranger Glenn Elliott Memorial Highway and
 any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *