Senate | 05/15/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1624 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1624 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1553 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3548 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3139 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3137 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | RV#919 | Journal Page: 3139 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3139 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3139 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3125 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Amended | 1-S. Thompson | Journal Page: 3125 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3125 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3014 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2966 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1742 | |
House | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 771 | |
House | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 771 | |
House | 03/06/2015 | Filed |