Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB257 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Farney, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 257
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a judge's or justice's significant interest in a
 business entity that owns, manages, or operates a private
 correctional or rehabilitation facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 21.010(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  A justice or judge is considered to have a significant
 interest in a business entity described by Subsection (a) for
 purposes of this section if:
 (1)  the justice or judge owns any voting stock or share
 or has a direct investment in the business entity [that represents
 the lesser of at least 10 percent or $15,000 of the fair market
 value of the business entity]; or
 (2)  the justice or judge receives money from the
 business entity.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2017.
 * * * * *