House | 05/15/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3615 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Record vote | RV#1146 | Journal Page: 3614 |
House | 05/15/2015 | Failed to pass | Journal Page: 3614 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3614 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3508 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3508 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3508 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2675 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 729 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 729 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Filed |